Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Abel Mamba Diatta

Bishop of Ziguinchor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1960 BornCabrousse
8 Apr 198827.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ziguinchor, Senegal
21 Jul 201049.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ziguinchor, Senegal
25 Jan 201251.1AppointedBishop of Ziguinchor, Senegal
21 Apr 201251.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ziguinchor, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Paul Abel Mamba Diatta:
Bishop Paul Abel Mamba Diatta (born ) Bishop of Ziguinchor

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ziguinchor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2012
  • ab/aadm: CB, 25 Jan 2012
  • ob: CB, 18 Feb 2012
  • c2+: CB, 19 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,424

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013