Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Noël Diouf

Bishop Emeritus of Tambacounda, Senegal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1946 Born
3 Apr 197225.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 198942.5AppointedBishop of Tambacounda, Senegal
12 Nov 198943.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tambacounda, Senegal
5 Aug 201770.8ResignedBishop of Tambacounda, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Jean-Noël Diouf
Bishop Jean-Noël Diouf (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tambacounda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiohine
Ordained BishopSte Marie Reine, Cathedral, Tambacounda, Diocese of Tambacounda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tambacounda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,587
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018