Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Yapi

Deceased

Bishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1937Born
21 Dec 196326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
21 Sep 197032.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
21 Sep 197032.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
25 Oct 197033.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
12 Jan 197941.3AppointedBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
17 Aug 198042.8DiedBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Laurent Yapi
Bishop Laurent Yapi (born , died ) Bishop of Abengourou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMemni

  • a priest for 16.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017