Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vital Komenan Yao

Deceased

Archbishop of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1938Born
19 Dec 196426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire
17 May 197335.3AppointedBishop of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire
29 Jul 197335.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire
19 Dec 199456.9AppointedArchbishop of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire
22 Sep 200668.7DiedArchbishop of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Vital Komenan Yao
Archbishop Vital Komenan Yao (born 1938, died ) Archbishop of Bouaké

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoffiyaokro

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017