Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Sylvain Emien Mambé

Apostolic Nuncio to Mali

Titular Archbishop of Potentia in Piceno

Apostolic Nuncio to Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1970 Born
14 Dec 199727.2Ordained PriestPriest of Yopougon, Côte d’Ivoire
2 Feb 202251.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mali
2 Feb 202251.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Potentia in Piceno
7 May 202251.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Potentia in Piceno
12 Nov 202252.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea

MicroData Summary for Jean-Sylvain Emien Mambé
(VIAF: 164253846; WikiData: Q110796062)
Archbishop Jean-Sylvain Emien Mambé (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Mali

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJacqueville
Ordained BishopSaint-Paul du Plateau, Cathedral, Abidjan, Archdiocese of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Mali.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2022
  • nm: CB, 3 Feb 2022
  • ob: CB, 14 Apr 2022
  • c2+: CB, 21 Apr 2022
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 252, Number 20,917
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 13 Nov 2023