Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nobert Tamba Sandouno

Bishop of Guéckédou, Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1967 Born
18 Nov 200740.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kankan, Guinea
29 Jun 202356.0AppointedBishop of Guéckédou, Guinea
12 Nov 202356.4Ordained BishopBishop of Guéckédou, Guinea

MicroData Summary for Nobert Tamba Sandouno
Bishop Nobert Tamba Sandouno (born ) Bishop of Guéckédou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoniandou
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame du Rosaire, Cathedral, Guéckédou, Diocese of Guéckédou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guéckédou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2023
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 Aug 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 13 Nov 2023