Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincent Coulibaly

Archbishop of Conakry {Konakry}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1953 BornKéniéran
9 May 198128.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 199340.7AppointedBishop of Kankan, Guinea
12 Feb 199440.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kankan, Guinea
6 May 200350.1AppointedArchbishop of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea

MicroData Summary for Vincent Coulibaly:
Archbishop Vincent Coulibaly (born ) Archbishop of Conakry {Konakry}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Conakry {Konakry}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013