Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Joseph Moury, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio

Titular Bishop of Ariassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1873BornAgnat, France
30 May 189622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
18 Jan 191036.3AppointedPrefect of Costa d’Avorio
17 Nov 191138.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ariassus
17 Nov 191138.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio
6 Jun 191238.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ariassus
29 Mar 193561.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio

MicroData Summary for Jules-Joseph Moury:
Bishop Jules-Joseph Moury S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 35
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013