Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Steinmetz, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dahomey

Titular Bishop of Hadriani ad Olympum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1868BornMorschwiller, France
13 Jul 189022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
27 Jun 190638.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dahomey, Benin
27 Jun 190638.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadriani ad Olympum
28 Oct 190638.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadriani ad Olympum
12 Nov 193466.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Dahomey, Benin
29 Mar 195284.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dahomey, Benin

MicroData Summary for François Steinmetz:
Bishop François Steinmetz S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dahomey

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 37
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013