Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Cessou, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Lomé

Titular Bishop of Verinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1884BornQuimper, France
19 Jul 190823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
11 Jan 192136.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Togo
20 Mar 192338.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Togo
20 Mar 192338.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
15 Jul 192338.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
3 Mar 194560.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Lomé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Cessou:
Bishop Jean-Marie Cessou S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Lomé

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015