Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis O’Rourke, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin

Titular Bishop of Ostracine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1882BornFenagh, Ireland
15 Jul 190623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
14 May 192946.5AppointedPrefect of Northern Nigeria {Nigeria Settentrionale}
27 Mar 193047.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria
27 Mar 193047.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ostracine
15 Jun 193047.6Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria
28 Oct 193856.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Francis O’Rourke:
Bishop Francis O’Rourke S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015