Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leo Hale Taylor, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lagos

Titular Archbishop of Madytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1889BornMontevideo, MN, USA
21 Jun 191424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
26 Feb 193444.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}
26 Feb 193444.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vartana
24 Jun 193444.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vartana
13 Jun 193949.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria
18 Apr 195060.6AppointedArchbishop of Lagos, Nigeria
6 Jul 196575.8RetiredArchbishop of Lagos, Nigeria
6 Jul 196575.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Madytus
27 Oct 196576.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lagos, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Leo Hale Taylor:
Archbishop Leo Hale Taylor S.M.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lagos

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013