Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Finn, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ibadan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1912BornClaremorris
14 Dec 194129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
13 Mar 195341.0AppointedPrefect of Ibadan, Nigeria
13 Nov 195846.7AppointedBishop of Ibadan, Nigeria
8 Feb 195946.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ibadan, Nigeria
3 Jul 197462.3ResignedBishop of Ibadan, Nigeria
4 Jan 198976.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ibadan, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Richard Finn:
Bishop Richard Finn S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ibadan

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Oct 2013