Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Benin City

Archidioecesis Urbis Beninensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Augustine Obiora Akubeze, Archbishop
  • Richard Anthony Burke, S.P.S., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Patrick Ebosele Ekpu, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 26 March 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 13,678 (5,283 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diobenin.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box 35, 30 Airport Rd., Benin City, Edo State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (0813)64.43.724

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Upper Niger {Niger Superiore}
2 May 1884ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées} Prefecture Apostolic of Upper Niger {Niger Superiore} (erected)
24 August 1911Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Upper Niger {Niger Superiore} Prefecture Apostolic of Eastern Nigeria {Nigeria Orientale} (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}
24 August 1911Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Upper Niger {Niger Superiore} Prefecture Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}
24 August 1918ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}
9 July 1934Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale} Prefecture Apostolic of Calabar (erected)
9 July 1934Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale} Prefecture Apostolic of Benue (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Asaba-Benin
12 January 1943Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Asaba-Benin
Diocese of Benin City
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Asaba-Benin Diocese of Benin City
21 February 1955Territory LostDiocese of Benin City
Diocese of Kaduna
Prefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kabba (erected)
10 March 1964Territory LostDiocese of Benin City Diocese of Warri (erected)
5 July 1973Territory LostDiocese of Benin City Diocese of Issele-Uku (erected)
Archdiocese of Benin City
26 March 1994ElevatedDiocese of Benin City Archdiocese of Benin City
4 December 2002Territory LostArchdiocese of Benin City Diocese of Auchi (erected)
14 December 2005Territory LostArchdiocese of Benin City Diocese of Uromi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Benin City
195899,2531,392,1167.1%746531,8721817ap1960
1970140,9541,450,0009.7%2038582,43042338ap1971
1980110,1011,100,00010.0%2112333,336165218ap1981
1990198,0171,853,00010.7%3820583,414367634ap1991
Archdiocese of Benin City
1999389,5092,521,29115.4%84261103,540419640ap2000
2000391,0092,708,98014.4%86221083,620379643ap2001
2001392,5402,710,51114.5%90241143,443579643ap2002
2002934,0712,712,04234.4%98231217,719349850ap2003
2003330,5912,340,40114.1%83211043,178285531ap2004
2004343,8002,882,41011.9%84241083,183365833ap2005
2005241,7552,094,52611.5%3515504,8354421bul14Dec2005
2006363,0003,043,00011.9%6228904,033777754ap2007
2012128,7501,856,7616.9%81231041,237557362ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013