Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Olu Chukwuka Nwaezeapu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Warri, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1925Born
2 Feb 195832.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 196438.2AppointedBishop of Warri, Nigeria
24 May 196438.4Ordained BishopBishop of Warri, Nigeria
10 Sep 198357.7ResignedBishop of Warri, Nigeria
21 Apr 199670.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Warri, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Lucas Olu Chukwuka Nwaezeapu
Bishop Lucas Olu Chukwuka Nwaezeapu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Warri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbusa

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast