Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Enugu

Dioecesis Enuguensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 12 November 1962
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Onitsha
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 2,738 (1,057 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 302, Ogui, Enugu, Enugu State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (042)25.58.33

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
12 November 1962ErectedArchdiocese of Onitsha Diocese of Enugu (erected)
19 November 1990Territory LostDiocese of Enugu Diocese of Nsukka (erected)
8 July 2005Territory LostDiocese of Enugu Diocese of Awgu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1969550ap1971
1980350,0002,365,00014.8%6613794,4303415738ap1981
1990998,9872,740,97336.4%126381646,09128616761ap1991
1999603,0001,028,00058.7%128441723,50544828987ap2000
20002,000,0003,600,00055.6%1384518310,92844729595ap2001
20012,100,0003,700,00056.8%187512388,82341434395ap2002
20022,117,3363,734,51656.7%181532349,04840739098ap2003
20032,146,0953,752,27657.2%208542628,191373405112ap2004
20042,188,1403,857,15756.7%214582728,044401434123ap2005
2005840,0001,400,00060.0%176512273,700185352101bul08Jul2005
20061,270,9792,118,29860.0%191512425,251285352111ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 4 Jul 2013