Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godfrey Mary Paul Okoye, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Enugu, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1915Born
27 Jul 194731.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
16 May 196145.4AppointedBishop of Port Harcourt, Nigeria
3 Sep 196145.7Ordained BishopBishop of Port Harcourt, Nigeria
7 Mar 197054.2AppointedBishop of Enugu, Nigeria
17 Mar 197761.2DiedBishop of Enugu, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Godfrey Mary Paul Okoye (VIAF: 26352287)
Bishop Godfrey Mary Paul Okoye C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Enugu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIfite Kkpo

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • mn: CB, 8 Mar 2019
  • by: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1977, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast