Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Akwali Okafor

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Awka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1934BornIfitedunu
21 Jul 196328.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 199257.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Awka, Nigeria
6 Mar 199257.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Augurus
30 May 199257.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augurus
9 Sep 199459.8AppointedBishop of Awka, Nigeria
17 Apr 201075.4RetiredBishop of Awka, Nigeria
29 Aug 201479.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Awka, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Simon Akwali Okafor:
Bishop Simon Akwali Okafor (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Awka

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,919
  • d: CB, 1 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014