Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Ifeanyichukwu Okoye

Bishop of Awgu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1950 BornOwelli
22 Jul 197828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Enugu, Nigeria
8 Jul 200554.9AppointedBishop of Awgu, Nigeria
29 Sep 200555.2Ordained BishopBishop of Awgu, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John Ifeanyichukwu Okoye:
Bishop John Ifeanyichukwu Okoye (born ) Bishop of Awgu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Awgu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b:: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,994

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013