Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Abuja

Archidioecesis Abugensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Olorunfemi Onaiyekan, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Anselm Umoren, M.S.P.N., Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 26 March 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 8,000 (3,090 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Area 3, Section 2, P.O. Box 286, Garki, Abuja, Federal Capital Territory, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (0803)45.11.635

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Abuja
6 November 1981ErectedDiocese of Minna Mission "Sui Iuris" of Abuja (erected)
Diocese of Abuja
19 June 1989ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Abuja Diocese of Abuja
Archdiocese of Abuja
26 March 1994ElevatedDiocese of Abuja Archdiocese of Abuja

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Abuja
19909,390423,0002.2%141024391931610ap1991
Archdiocese of Abuja
199746,708780,4136.0%2421451,0371007023ap2000
200071,000700,00010.1%3017471,5101087827ap2001
200172,000750,0009.6%3721581,2411288928ap2002
2002280,0002,000,00014.0%3622584,8271348931ap2003
2003307,2502,000,00015.4%6619853,61413912632ap2004
2004200,0002,300,0008.7%7021912,1973813236ap2005
2005205,0002,357,0008.7%74261002,0504413437ap2006
2006350,0002,429,00014.4%4021615,73716212937ap2007
2009538,0002,991,00018.0%62501124,80316316746ap2012
2012542,1053,096,00017.5%82501324,10612516767ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013