Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kaduna

Archidioecesis Kadunaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Matthew Man-oso Ndagoso, Archbishop
  • Peter Yariyok Jatau, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 July 1959
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 17,094 (6,602 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://kadunaecclesia.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 248, 71 Tafawa Balewa Way, Kaduna, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (080)734.82.374
  • Fax: (062)240.026

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Eastern Nigeria {Nigeria Orientale}
24 August 1911ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Upper Niger {Niger Superiore} Prefecture Apostolic of Eastern Nigeria {Nigeria Orientale} (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Nigeria {Nigeria Settentrionale}
18 July 1929Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Eastern Nigeria {Nigeria Orientale} Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Nigeria {Nigeria Settentrionale}
9 April 1934Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Nigeria {Nigeria Settentrionale} Prefecture Apostolic of Jos (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
9 April 1934ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Nigeria {Nigeria Settentrionale} Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
28 April 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Niamey (erected)
29 June 1953Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Kaduna Prefecture Apostolic of Sokoto (erected)
Diocese of Kaduna
29 June 1953ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kaduna Diocese of Kaduna
21 February 1955Territory LostDiocese of Benin City
Diocese of Kaduna
Prefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kabba (erected)
Archdiocese of Kaduna
16 July 1959ElevatedDiocese of Kaduna Archdiocese of Kaduna
9 November 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of Kaduna Prefecture Apostolic of Minna (erected)
22 March 1991Territory LostArchdiocese of Kaduna Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kano (erected)
10 July 1995Territory LostArchdiocese of Jos
Archdiocese of Kaduna
Diocese of Kafanchan (erected)
5 December 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Kaduna Diocese of Zaria (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
194916,8876,000,000.3%28286031710ap1951
Diocese of Kaduna
Archdiocese of Kaduna
197054,0007,900,000.7%340431,255414922ap1971
1980145,7957,489,0001.9%1339522,8033923ap1981
1990321,2577,449,0004.3%4226684,724261843ap1991
1999318,4433,240,0009.8%6010704,549102245ap2000
2000253,5022,163,00011.7%5310634,023102235ap2001
2001269,1502,163,00012.4%448525,17582235ap2002
2002280,1502,163,00013.0%4510555,093102235ap2003
2003310,5432,248,00013.8%668744,19682742ap2004
2004323,0764,951,3106.5%728804,03882741ap2005
2006382,6385,230,0007.3%888963,98582743ap2007
2011545,3805,916,0009.2%7612886,197372650ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 23 Jul 2013