Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Yakubu Kundi

Bishop of Kafanchan, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1968 Born
14 Jun 199729.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kaduna, Nigeria
5 Dec 200032.8IncardinatedPriest of Zaria, Nigeria
12 Dec 201951.8AppointedBishop of Kafanchan, Nigeria
20 Feb 202052.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kafanchan, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Julius Yakubu Kundi
Bishop Julius Yakubu Kundi (born ) Bishop of Kafanchan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDanladi, Archdiocese of Kaduna
Ordained BishopNew Kafanchan Township Stadium, Kafanchan, Diocese of Kafanchan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kafanchan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2019
  • ob: CB, 23 Dec 2019
  • ob.loc: AM, 29 Jan 2020
  • c2+: CB, 20 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast