Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Khartoum

Archidioecesis Khartumensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gabriel Zubeir Wako, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Daniel Marco Kur Adwok, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 December 1974
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Sudan
  • Square Kilometers: 981,000 (378,911 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://archdioceseofkhartoum.catholicweb.com/
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Church, P.O. Box 49, Khartoum, Sudan
  • Telephone: (183)782.174
  • Fax: 783.518

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}
3 April 1846ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale} (erected)
27 September 1880Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}
30 May 1913Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale} Prefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
30 May 1913Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale} Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
10 January 1933Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Khartoum Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kodok (erected)
28 April 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Niamey (erected)
9 January 1947Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Berbérati
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Prefecture Apostolic of Fort-Lamy (erected)
10 May 1960Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Khartoum Vicariate Apostolic of El Obeid (erected)
Archdiocese of Khartoum
12 December 1974ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Khartoum Archdiocese of Khartoum

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
19503,3005,900,000.1%404082571096ap1951
196915,4465,007,616.3%45453435712111ap1971
Archdiocese of Khartoum
198073,4008,030,000.9%251531,38416213115ap1981
1990390,00014,000,0002.8%861695,65217915522ap1991
1999907,42019,696,4044.6%53701237,377410715229ap2000
2000915,46919,895,2794.6%57591167,89148613629ap2001
2001923,51820,293,1844.6%60541148,10148315329ap2002
2002932,78420,299,1844.6%71481197,83848115028ap2003
2003939,46621,113,0294.4%67501178,02947914228ap2004
2004944,37621,205,5004.5%77421197,93546414428ap2005
2006954,66022,062,2014.3%68461148,37447615228ap2007
2012983,09825,946,2203.8%47378411,70325413727ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013