Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Buta

Dioecesis Butanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Banga Bane, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kisangani
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 60,000 (23,175 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 105, Buta, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (099)779.23.02; (081)088.74.28

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Uélé / Wellé
1898ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Uélé / Wellé (erected)
18 December 1911Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Uélé / Wellé Prefecture Apostolic of Eastern Uélé {Uélé Orientale} (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental}
18 December 1911Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Uélé / Wellé Prefecture Apostolic of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental}
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental}
15 April 1924ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental} Vicariate Apostolic of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental}
10 March 1926Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental} Prefecture Apostolic of Bondo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Buta
10 March 1926Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental} Vicariate Apostolic of Buta
22 February 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Buta Prefecture Apostolic of Lolo (erected)
Diocese of Buta
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Buta Diocese of Buta

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Buta
195044,848225,00019.9%55257786108102ap1951
Diocese of Buta
195853,575224,45523.9%9536286461817ap1960
196970,000238,00029.4%810183,88818499ap1971
1980135,278288,85546.8%129216,441175116ap1981
1990165,200325,00050.8%169256,608115617ap1991
1995189,850259,00073.3%247316,12495317ap2007
2012264,000422,00062.6%1011124,00023916ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013