Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Lisala

Dioecesis Lisalaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ernest Ngboko Ngombe, C.I.C.M., Bishop
  • Louis Nkinga Bondala, C.I.C.M., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 67,674 (26,139 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Évêché de Lisala, c/o Procure Sainte Anne, B.P. 1800, Kinshasa 1, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (081)725.11.82; (084)235.53.11

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Nouvelle-Anvers
3 April 1919ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nouvelle-Anvers (erected)
11 February 1924Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nouvelle-Anvers Prefecture Apostolic of Tsuapa (erected)
28 July 1926Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nouvelle-Anvers Prefecture Apostolic of Basankusu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lisala
27 January 1936Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Nouvelle-Anvers Vicariate Apostolic of Lisala
14 June 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Basankusu
Vicariate Apostolic of Lisala
Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville
Prefecture Apostolic of Isangi (erected)
Diocese of Lisala
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Lisala Diocese of Lisala
25 November 1964Territory LostDiocese of Lisala Diocese of Budjala (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Lisala
1950217,528725,00030.0%91121211,7979122ap1951
Diocese of Lisala
1970273,156440,45762.0%1656723,793898217ap1971
1980346,803540,89464.1%2135566,192568118ap1981
1990478,163681,00070.2%3817558,693358721ap1991
1997503,0331,070,52747.0%604647,859266424ap2000
2000650,0001,200,00054.2%5846210,483256225ap2001
2001650,0001,200,00054.2%5075711,403286425ap2002
2002560,0001,230,00045.5%4434711,914286525ap2003
2003660,0001,300,00050.8%5525711,578246825ap2004
2004767,2321,400,00054.8%5215314,476237526ap2005
2013897,0001,683,00053.3%6336613,590398528ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.7, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015