Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Nkinga Bondala, C.I.C.M.

Bishop of Lisala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1937 BornMankanza
7 Aug 196629.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
28 Jan 198042.6AppointedBishop of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
4 May 198042.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Mar 199658.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Jul 199760.0SucceededBishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Louis Nkinga Bondala:
Bishop Louis Nkinga Bondala C.I.C.M. (born ) Bishop of Lisala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lisala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013