Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph-Albert Cardinal Malula

Deceased

Archbishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Protomartiri a Via Aurelia Antica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1917Born
9 Jun 194628.4Ordained PriestPriest of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Jul 195941.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Jul 195941.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Attanasus
20 Sep 195941.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attanasus
7 Jul 196446.5AppointedArchbishop of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Aug 196446.6InstalledArchbishop of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Apr 196951.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196951.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Protomartiri a Via Aurelia Antica
14 Jun 198971.4DiedArchbishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Albert Malula
Joseph-Albert Cardinal Malula (born , died ) Archbishop of Kinshasa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLéopoldville
Ordained BishopStade du Roi Baudouin, Léopoldville, Archdiocese of Léopoldville

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
  • a cardinal for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 79
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 468, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 592
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 725, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,096, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast