Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin-Léonard Bakole wa Ilunga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1920Born
19 Mar 195332.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 196646.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luluabourg, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Jun 196646.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sullectum
18 Sep 196646.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sullectum
26 Sep 196747.4AppointedArchbishop of Luluabourg, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Mar 199776.8RetiredArchbishop of Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Feb 200079.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Martin-Léonard Bakole wa Ilunga
Archbishop Martin-Léonard Bakole wa Ilunga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kananga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIlebo

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Feb 2017