Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugène Kabanga Songasonga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1932Born
21 Aug 196129.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Apr 196734.6AppointedArchbishop of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Aug 196734.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Mar 199865.5ResignedArchbishop of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Jan 200067.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Eugène Kabanga Songasonga
Archbishop Eugène Kabanga Songasonga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lubumbashi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKyamitofwe

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018