Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elie Amsini Kiswaya

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sakania-Kipushi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1928BornKindu
26 Jul 195930.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 197547.2AppointedBishop of Sakania, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Feb 197647.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sakania, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Dec 200173.3ResignedBishop of Sakania-Kipushi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Dec 200880.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Sakania-Kipushi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Elie Amsini Kiswaya:
Bishop Elie Amsini Kiswaya (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sakania-Kipushi

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013