Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lubumbashi

Archidioecesis Lubumbashiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 30 May 1966
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 61,828 (23,881 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 72, Lubumbashi, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: 48.601

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Katanga
5 August 1910ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Katanga (erected)
12 May 1925ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Katanga (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Luapula Superiore (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Katanga
22 March 1932ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Katanga Vicariate Apostolic of Katanga
Archdiocese of Elisabethville
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Katanga Archdiocese of Elisabethville
Archdiocese of Lubumbashi
30 May 1966Name ChangedArchdiocese of Elisabethville Archdiocese of Lubumbashi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Katanga
195072,502210,00034.5%67671,082971243ap1951
Archdiocese of Elisabethville
Archdiocese of Lubumbashi
1968237,655550,32443.2%53961491,59516527037ap1971
1980518,000906,00057.2%31901214,28012327150ap1981
1987686,2001,440,61247.6%53931464,700113730558ap1991
1999442,153849,00552.1%62681303,40122636755ap2000
2000957,6551,075,35889.1%661031695,66628335661ap2001
2001960,4551,078,62389.0%70851556,19626340475ap2002
2002966,4911,964,26649.2%74911655,85728031575ap2003
2003974,9622,244,57643.4%77991765,53928033275ap2004
2004884,7001,973,78544.8%821041864,75630937175ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 9 Aug 2012