Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kamina

Dioecesis Kaminaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lubumbashi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 73,479 (28,381 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 309, Kamina-Ville, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (081)280.61.15

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale
18 July 1922ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore
Prefecture Apostolic of Katanga
Prefecture Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale
26 February 1934ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale Vicariate Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale
8 July 1948Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale Prefecture Apostolic of Lac Moero (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lulua
8 July 1948Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale Vicariate Apostolic of Lulua
Diocese of Kamina
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Lulua Diocese of Kamina
7 November 1970Territory AddedDiocese of Kabinda
Diocese of Kamina
Diocese of Kongolo
Archdiocese of Lubumbashi
Diocese of Mbujimayi
11 March 1971Territory LostDiocese of Kamina (Western and Southern part) Diocese of Kolwezi (erected)
12 January 1974Territory AddedDiocese of Kabinda (Kaniama) Diocese of Kamina

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Lulua
194935,322300,00011.8%251536666891ap1951
Diocese of Kamina
1970117,771595,25219.8%977861,369932343ap1971
1980137,014334,18041.0%523284,893267815ap1981
1990212,060570,62237.2%1022326,626236915ap1991
1999201,198881,48422.8%2316395,158217818ap2000
2000222,447883,54925.2%2321445,055268218ap2001
2001241,455703,29634.3%3220524,643249927ap2002
2002241,900660,28036.6%3118494,936239019ap2003
2003199,916746,22326.8%4217593,388226423ap2004
2006216,991784,66927.7%3017474,616219225ap2007
2011238,871839,81928.4%3115465,192209128ap2012
2013378,0651,416,69026.7%4015556,873188530ap2014
2016485,6961,903,17725.5%4815637,709228230ap2017
2019507,5682,064,60024.6%4919687,464236731ap2020
2021513,0002,253,35022.8%6113746,932147235ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 27, Page 249, and Page 250
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Lulua
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 41, Page 33, and Page 34
  • Diocese of Kamina
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 52, Page 372, to Page 377
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 62, Page 781, to Page 783
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 66, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 11 Nov 2023