Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camille Valentin Stappers, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lulua

Titular Bishop of Ceramus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1885BornHasselt
1 Sep 191227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jul 192237.0AppointedPrefect of Lulua e Katanga Centrale, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Feb 193448.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
26 Feb 193448.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Jun 193448.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
Mar 1950³64.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Lulua, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Jan 196478.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lulua, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camille Valentin Stappers:
Bishop Camille Valentin Stappers O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lulua

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015