Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Sak, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Sakania

Titular Bishop of Scilium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1875BornHechtel, Belgium
23 Sep 189924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Jul 192449.4AppointedPrefect of Luapula Superiore, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Nov 193964.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Scilium
14 Nov 193964.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sakania, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 Apr 194065.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scilium
15 Mar 194671.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Sakania, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sak:
Bishop Joseph Sak S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Sakania

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015