Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin-Hubert Rutten

Deceased

Bishop of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1841Born
21 Oct 186624.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Liège, Belgium
28 Apr 186725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
16 Dec 190159.9AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
6 Jan 190260.0Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
17 Jul 192785.5DiedBishop of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium

MicroData Summary for Martin-Hubert Rutten
Bishop Martin-Hubert Rutten (born , died ) Bishop of Liège (Luik, Lüttich)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeystingen

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 338
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,902, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast