Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cirilo Polidoro Van Vlierberghe, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Illapel, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1909Born
12 Sep 192718.5EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
19 Aug 193425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Mar 196152.0InstalledApostolic Administrator of Illapel, Chile
27 Jun 196657.3AppointedPrelate of Illapel, Chile
27 Jun 196657.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Municipa
28 Aug 196657.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Municipa
17 Nov 197768.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Municipa
11 Aug 198475.4RetiredPrelate of Illapel, Chile
9 May 200697.1DiedPrelate Emeritus of Illapel, Chile

MicroData Summary for Cirilo Polidoro Van Vlierberghe
Bishop Cirilo Polidoro Van Vlierberghe O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Illapel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaesmunster, Belgium
Ordained PriestSt. Trondt, Belgium

  • a priest for 71.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017