Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto Fuenzalida Guzmán

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1868Born
20 Dec 189022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
20 Feb 191850.0AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
7 Jun 191850.3Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
23 Jun 191850.3InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
24 Mar 193870.1DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Fuenzalida Guzmán (VIAF: 58408049)
Bishop Gilberto Fuenzalida Guzmán (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalca
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 30
  • opl: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017