Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Osvaldo Salinas Fuenzalida, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Linares, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1899Born
1923²23.3EnteredMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
16 Dec 192829.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
29 Aug 193939.9AppointedBishop of Temuco, Chile
26 Nov 193940.2Ordained BishopBishop of Temuco, Chile
Dec 1939³40.2InstalledBishop of Temuco, Chile
9 Feb 194141.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
9 Feb 194141.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisyrus
3 Aug 195050.8AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
21 Oct 195051.1InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
15 Jun 195858.7AppointedBishop of Linares, Chile
29 Aug 195858.9InstalledBishop of Linares, Chile
11 Dec 197677.2RetiredBishop of Linares, Chile
1 Aug 199191.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Linares, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augusto Osvaldo Salinas Fuenzalida (VIAF: 94894227)
Bishop Augusto Osvaldo Salinas Fuenzalida SS.CC. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Linares

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestValparaíso, Diocese of Valparaíso

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 51.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 72
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017