Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Bernardo Eugenín Barrientos, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chile, Military

Titular Bishop of Hierissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1886BornDalcahue
9 Jan 191023.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
192740.3IncardinatedPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
10 Apr 193144.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Valdivia, Chile
10 Apr 193144.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierissus
31 May 193144.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierissus
30 Jun 193144.8InstalledApostolic Administrator of Valdivia, Chile
20 Jun 194255.8AppointedBishop of Chile, Military
21 Dec 195973.3RetiredBishop of Chile, Military
24 Nov 197488.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Chile, Military

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Bernardo Eugenín Barrientos:
Bishop Teodoro Bernardo Eugenín Barrientos SS.CC. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chile, Military

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015