Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vladimiro Boric Crnosija, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Punta Arenas, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1905Born
14 Feb 192216.8First VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1925²19.6Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Jan 193024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1 Feb 194943.7AppointedBishop of Punta Arenas, Chile
2 Oct 194944.4Ordained BishopBishop of Punta Arenas, Chile
29 Aug 197368.3DiedBishop of Punta Arenas, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vladimiro Boric Crnosija
Bishop Vladimiro Boric Crnosija S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Punta Arenas

EventPlace
Birth PlacePunta Arenas

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 89
  • prof/perp/c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017