Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Goić Karmelić

Bishop Emeritus of Rancagua, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1940 Born
12 Mar 196626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Punta Arenas, Chile
23 Apr 197939.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
23 Apr 197939.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Africa
27 May 197939.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Africa
Jun 1991³51.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Talca, Chile
27 Oct 199454.6AppointedBishop of Osorno, Chile
25 Nov 199454.7InstalledBishop of Osorno, Chile
10 Jul 200363.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rancagua, Chile
23 Apr 200464.1SucceededBishop of Rancagua, Chile
28 Jun 201878.3RetiredBishop of Rancagua, Chile

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Goić Karmelić (VIAF: 160971049)
Bishop Alejandro Goić Karmelić (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rancagua

EventPlace
Birth PlacePunta Arenas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rancagua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Jun 2018

Quantcast