Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raúl Cardinal Silva Henríquez, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1907BornTalca
3 Jul 193830.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Oct 195952.1AppointedBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
29 Nov 195952.2Ordained BishopBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
14 May 196153.6AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
24 Jun 196153.7InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
19 Mar 196254.5Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 196254.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
3 May 198375.6RetiredArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
9 Apr 199991.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Raúl Silva Henríquez:
Raúl Cardinal Silva Henríquez S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
  • a cardinal for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 102
  • c1: CB, 6 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 16 Nov 2014