Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristián Caro Cordero

Archbishop of Puerto Montt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1943 BornSantiago de Chile
23 Dec 197330.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
12 Mar 199148.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
12 Mar 199148.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcavica
14 Apr 199148.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcavica
27 Feb 200158.0AppointedArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile

MicroData Summary for Cristián Caro Cordero:
Archbishop Cristián Caro Cordero (born ) Archbishop of Puerto Montt

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Puerto Montt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,399
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013