Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos González Cruchaga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Talca, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1921Born
23 Sep 194423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
4 Jan 196745.5AppointedBishop of Talca, Chile
7 May 196745.9Ordained BishopBishop of Talca, Chile
12 Dec 199675.5RetiredBishop of Talca, Chile
21 Sep 200887.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Talca, Chile

MicroData Summary for Carlos González Cruchaga (VIAF: 43939702)
Bishop Carlos González Cruchaga (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Talca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017