Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ignacio González Errázuriz

Bishop of San Bernardo, Chile

Apostolic Administrator of Rancagua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1956 Born
31 Jan 199336.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Opus Dei
13 Jun 199336.9Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
10 Oct 200347.2AppointedBishop of San Bernardo, Chile
22 Nov 200347.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Bernardo, Chile
2 Mar 202063.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rancagua, Chile

MicroData Summary for Juan Ignacio González Errázuriz (VIAF: 311409372)
Bishop Juan Ignacio González Errázuriz (born ) Bishop of San Bernardo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained DeaconRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Bernardo, Diocese of San Bernardo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Bernardo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,484
  • od/c01: CB, 13 Apr 2017
  • ab: CB, 2 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast