Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orozimbo Fuenzalida y Fuenzalida

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Bernardo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1925BornRancagua
10 Mar 195125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Rancagua, Chile
13 Mar 196842.8AppointedPrelate of Calama, Chile
13 Mar 196842.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Burca
19 May 196842.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Burca
26 Feb 197044.7AppointedBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
18 Apr 197044.9InstalledBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
13 Jul 198762.1AppointedBishop of San Bernardo, Chile
10 Oct 200378.3RetiredBishop of San Bernardo, Chile
27 Mar 201387.8DiedBishop Emeritus of San Bernardo, Chile

MicroData Summary for Orozimbo Fuenzalida y Fuenzalida:
Bishop Orozimbo Fuenzalida y Fuenzalida (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Bernardo

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Mar 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015