Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Caviedes Medina

Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1930 BornColtauco
18 Sep 195424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rancagua, Chile
8 Nov 198252.8AppointedBishop of Osorno, Chile
19 Dec 198252.9Ordained BishopBishop of Osorno, Chile
2 Jan 198352.9InstalledBishop of Osorno, Chile
19 Feb 199464.1AppointedBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
18 Mar 199464.1InstalledBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
7 Jan 200675.9RetiredBishop of Los Angeles, Chile

MicroData Summary for Miguel Caviedes Medina:
Bishop Miguel Caviedes Medina (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013