Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Cardinal Aloisi Masella

Deceased

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1879BornPontecorvo, Italy
1 Jun 190222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
20 Nov 191940.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
15 Dec 191940.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
21 Dec 191940.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
26 Apr 192747.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
18 Feb 194666.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 194666.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Vallicella
21 Jun 194869.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
27 Oct 195475.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
27 Oct 195475.3AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
9 Oct 195879.3AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
11 Jan 196888.5RetiredPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
30 Sep 197091.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Aloisi Masella:
Cardinal Benedetto Aloisi Masella (born , died ) Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of Apostolic Chamber

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 50.8 years
  • a cardinal for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 72
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013