Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eliseu Maria Coroli, B. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Guamá, Para, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Zama Major


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1900Born
15 Mar 192424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
10 Aug 194040.5AppointedPrelate of Guamá, Para, Brazil
10 Aug 194040.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Major
13 Oct 194040.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zama Major
5 Feb 197776.9ResignedPrelate of Guamá, Para, Brazil
29 Jul 198282.4DiedPrelate Emeritus of Guamá, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eliseu Maria Coroli
Bishop Eliseu Maria Coroli B. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Guamá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnuovo di Val Tidone, Italy

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast