Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregório Alonso Aparicio, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Marajó, Para, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Pogla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1894Born
15 Mar 191924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
9 Jan 194348.7AppointedPrelate of Marajó, Para, Brazil
9 Jan 194348.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pogla
11 Jul 194349.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pogla
7 Apr 196570.9ResignedPrelate of Marajó, Para, Brazil
12 May 198288.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Marajó, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gregório Alonso Aparicio
Bishop Gregório Alonso Aparicio O.A.R. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Marajó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuentelsaz, Spain

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018